+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 11, 2019 in the House:
- Effective date: See Act.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 231.
On June 5, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On June 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 3, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 31, 2019 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 93, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
On May 28, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for concurrence on 05/31/19.
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
On May 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 82, nays 2. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/14/19.
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (12-0-1).
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (3)
May 31, 2019: House Vote on HB 452, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#766)
- Yeas: 93
- Absent: 12
May 27, 2019: Senate Vote on HB 452, FINAL PASSAGE (#511)
- Yeas: 37
- Absent: 2
May 14, 2019: House Vote on HB 452, FINAL PASSAGE (#299)
- Yeas: 82
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 21
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor