+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 15, 2018 in the House:
- Effective date: 08/01/2018.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 319.
On May 11, 2018 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On May 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 11, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 10, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 83, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
On May 9, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for concurrence on 05/10/18.
On May 3, 2018 in the House:
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On April 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
On April 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On April 6, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 04/11/18.
On April 5, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Reported favorably (13-0).
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
May 10, 2018: House Vote on HB 449, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#967)
- Yeas: 83
- Absent: 22
May 3, 2018: Senate Vote on HB 449, FINAL PASSAGE (#719)
- Yeas: 31
- Absent: 8
May 3, 2018: Senate Vote on HB 449, CO-AUTHORS (#721)
- Yeas: 19
- Absent: 20
April 11, 2018: House Vote on HB 449, FINAL PASSAGE (#366)
- Yeas: 97
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsors (73)
Type:
Primary Sponsor