+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
- Senate Committee amendments read and adopted.
On May 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 8. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/13/19.
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (17-0).
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (9)
+ − Vote
May 13, 2019: House Vote on HB 444, FINAL PASSAGE (#254)
- Yeas: 89
- Nays: 8
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor