+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
On May 20, 2019 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 53, nays 32. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider pending.
- Rules suspended, called out of its regular order.
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/20/19.
- Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (6-0).
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (11-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Vote
May 20, 2019: House Vote on HB 441, FINAL PASSAGE (#399)
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 32
- Absent: 20
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor