+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 24, 2019 in the House:
- Effective date: 08/01/2019.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 3.
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 20, 2019 in the House:
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
- Called from the calendar.
- Read by title, returned to the calendar.
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 04/25/19.
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably (5-0).
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/8/2019.
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
- Prefiled.
+ − Votes (2)
May 20, 2019: Senate Vote on HB 44, FINAL PASSAGE (#405)
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 4
April 25, 2019: House Vote on HB 44, FINAL PASSAGE (#53)
- Yeas: 94
- Absent: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor