+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On October 28, 2020 in the House:
- Effective date: 10/28/2020.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 18.
On October 23, 2020 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On October 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On October 22, 2020 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 92, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
- Rules suspended.
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
On October 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On October 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
- Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On October 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
On October 15, 2020 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 82, nays 12. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On October 14, 2020 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 10/15/20.
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
- Rules suspended.
- Reported with amendments (15-0).
On September 28, 2020 in the House:
- Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Votes (3)
October 22, 2020: Senate Vote on HB 43, FINAL PASSAGE (#212)
- Yeas: 36
- Absent: 3
October 22, 2020: House Vote on HB 43, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#246)
- Yeas: 92
- Absent: 13
October 15, 2020: House Vote on HB 43, FINAL PASSAGE (#145)
- Yeas: 82
- Nays: 12
- Absent: 11
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor