+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (30)
On June 26, 2017 in the House:
- Effective date: 07/01/17.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 418.
On June 14, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On June 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/9/2017.
On June 8, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
- Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
On June 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
On June 8, 2017 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
On June 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays.
On June 5, 2017 in the House:
- Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate conference committee members appointed: Morrell, Allain, and Luneau.
On June 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
On June 4, 2017 in the House:
- House conferees appointed: Magee, Abramson, and Miguez.
On June 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
On June 4, 2017 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 94, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
On June 1, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for concurrence on 06/04/17.
On May 30, 2017 in the House:
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/10/17.
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably (15-0).
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (5)
June 8, 2017: Senate Vote on HB 425, ADOPT (#949)
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 3
June 8, 2017: House Vote on HB 425, MOTION TO ADOPT (#942)
- Yeas: 96
- Absent: 9
June 4, 2017: House Vote on HB 425, REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#700)
- Yeas: 94
- Absent: 11
May 30, 2017: Senate Vote on HB 425, FINAL PASSAGE (#526)
- Yeas: 38
May 10, 2017: House Vote on HB 425, FINAL PASSAGE (#254)
- Yeas: 96
- Absent: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor