+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 26, 2016 in the House:
- Effective date: 08/01/2016.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 248.
On May 19, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On May 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 18, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 17, 2016 in the House:
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On May 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On April 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 85, nays 4. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 04/20/2016.
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Reported favorably (15-0).
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016.
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
- Prefiled.
+ − Votes (2)
May 17, 2016: Senate Vote on HB 424, FINAL PASSAGE (#824)
- Yeas: 37
- Absent: 2
April 20, 2016: House Vote on HB 424, FINAL PASSAGE (#405)
- Yeas: 85
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 15
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor