+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 11, 2019 in the House:
- Effective date: 08/01/2019.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 330.
On May 29, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 29, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 28, 2019 in the House:
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On May 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/07/19.
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably (14-0).
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 27, 2019: Senate Vote on HB 424, FINAL PASSAGE (#468)
- Yeas: 37
- Absent: 2
May 7, 2019: House Vote on HB 424, FINAL PASSAGE (#193)
- Yeas: 99
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor