+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 17, 2018 in the House:
- Notice removed
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 04/17/18.
- Notice given.
- Read by title, returned to the calendar.
On April 6, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 04/12/18.
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 5, 2018 in the House:
- Reported favorably (8-5-1).
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Education.
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor