+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On June 17, 2013 in the House:
- Effective date: August 1, 2013.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 314.
On June 6, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 6, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
- Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 1 nays.
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
On June 5, 2013 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 99, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
On June 4, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 6/5/2013.
On June 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report received.
On June 4, 2013 in the House:
- Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
- Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
On June 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate conference committee members appointed: Johns, Riser, and Crowe.
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Notice the House rejected the Senate amendments; House Conference Committee members appointed.
On June 2, 2013 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 100, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
- House conferees appointed: Talbot, Dixon, and Henry.
On May 29, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for concurrence on 6/02/2013.
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 100, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 5/6/2013.
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent calendar.
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably (10-0) (Local and Consent).
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/1/2013.
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
June 6, 2013: Senate Vote on HB 410, ADOPT (#1024)
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 4
June 5, 2013: House Vote on HB 410, MOTION TO ADOPT (#911)
- Yeas: 99
- Absent: 6
June 2, 2013: House Vote on HB 410, REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#728)
- Yeas: 100
- Absent: 5
May 23, 2013: Senate Vote on HB 410, FINAL PASSAGE (#573)
- Yeas: 38
- Absent: 1
May 6, 2013: House Vote on HB 410, FINAL PASSAGE (#261)
- Yeas: 100
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor