+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
On June 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 70, nays 18. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
- Called from the calendar.
- Rules suspended.
On June 18, 2020 in the House:
- Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
On June 17, 2020 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 45, nays 44. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider pending.
On June 15, 2020 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 06/17/20.
- Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
- Discharged from the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
On June 11, 2020 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
On June 10, 2020 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (8-6).
On June 5, 2020 in the House:
- Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (2)
June 23, 2020: House Vote on HB 41, FINAL PASSAGE (#98)
- Yeas: 70
- Nays: 18
- Absent: 16
June 17, 2020: House Vote on HB 41, FINAL PASSAGE (#64)
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 44
- Absent: 15
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor