+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 17, 2018 in the House:
- Effective date: 08/01/2018.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 269.
On May 10, 2018 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On May 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 9, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 8, 2018 in the House:
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On May 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance.
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 74, nays 15. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On April 19, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 04/24/18.
On April 16, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 13, 2018 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (11-4).
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (4)
May 8, 2018: Senate Vote on HB 408, FINAL PASSAGE (#858)
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 4
April 24, 2018: House Vote on HB 408, INSURANCE (#548)
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 65
- Absent: 20
April 24, 2018: House Vote on HB 408, AMENDMENT # 3403 BY WRIGHT, MOTION TO ADOPT (#549)
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 64
- Absent: 18
April 24, 2018: House Vote on HB 408, FINAL PASSAGE (#550)
- Yeas: 74
- Nays: 15
- Absent: 16
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor