+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 7, 2013 in the House:
- Effective date: August 1, 2013.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 156.
On May 31, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On May 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 29, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On May 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 5/7/2013.
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably (13-0) (Regular).
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/1/2013.
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
- Prefiled.
+ − Votes (2)
May 28, 2013: Senate Vote on HB 404, FINAL PASSAGE (#673)
- Yeas: 36
- Absent: 3
May 7, 2013: House Vote on HB 404, FINAL PASSAGE (#289)
- Yeas: 98
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor