+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 4, 2020 in the House:
- Effective date: 08/01/2020.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 27.
On May 29, 2020 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On May 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 22, 2020 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On May 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On May 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
On May 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On May 7, 2020 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On March 16, 2020 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/07/20.
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
- Rules suspended.
- Reported favorably (13-0).
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
- Prefiled.
+ − Votes (2)
May 21, 2020: Senate Vote on HB 400, FINAL PASSAGE (#304)
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 4
May 7, 2020: House Vote on HB 400, FINAL PASSAGE (#28)
- Yeas: 90
- Absent: 15
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor