+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 11, 2018 in the House:
- Effective date: 07/01/2018.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 114.
On May 3, 2018 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 2, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 1, 2018 in the House:
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement.
On March 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 85, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 03/22/18.
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (7-0).
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Retirement.
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement.
On January 26, 2018 in the House:
- First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 1/26/2018.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 1, 2018: Senate Vote on HB 40, FINAL PASSAGE (#677)
- Yeas: 37
- Absent: 2
March 22, 2018: House Vote on HB 40, FINAL PASSAGE (#98)
- Yeas: 85
- Absent: 19
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor