+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On June 9, 2014 in the House:
- Effective date: August 1, 2014.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 552.
On May 29, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 27, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 22, 2014 in the House:
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On May 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On May 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
On May 12, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 68, nays 16. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On May 6, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/12/2014.
- Notice given.
On April 28, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar.
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 04/28/2014.
- Notice given.
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, returned to the calendar.
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 04/01/2014.
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Reported favorably (16-0).
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
May 22, 2014: Senate Vote on HB 390, FINAL PASSAGE (#1324)
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
May 12, 2014: House Vote on HB 390, AMENDMENT # 4992 BY SCHEXNAYDER, MOTION TO ADOPT (#858)
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 28
- Absent: 17
May 12, 2014: House Vote on HB 390, FINAL PASSAGE (#859)
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 16
- Absent: 19
April 28, 2014: House Vote on HB 390, AMENDMENT # 4186 BY LANDRY, N., MOTION TO ADOPT (#646)
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 37
- Absent: 21
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor