+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On June 20, 2019 in the House:
- Effective date: 08/01/2019.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 381.
On June 10, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 6, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 89, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
- Rules suspended.
- Notice the Senate discharged the Conference Committee.
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Conference Committee members discharged.
- Notice the House discharged the Conference Committee.
On June 6, 2019 in the House:
- Discharged from Conference Committee.
On June 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate conference committee members appointed: Luneau, Mills, and Donahue.
On June 4, 2019 in the House:
- Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
On June 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
On June 4, 2019 in the House:
- House conferees appointed: White, Hoffmann, and Henry.
On June 3, 2019 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 97, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
On June 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
On June 2, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for concurrence on 06/03/19.
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
On June 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
On May 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/23/19.
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
- Discharged from the Committee on Appropriations.
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (12-0).
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (4)
June 6, 2019: House Vote on HB 390, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1042)
- Yeas: 89
- Absent: 16
June 3, 2019: House Vote on HB 390, REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#898)
- Yeas: 97
- Absent: 8
June 2, 2019: Senate Vote on HB 390, FINAL PASSAGE (#810)
- Yeas: 38
- Absent: 1
May 23, 2019: House Vote on HB 390, FINAL PASSAGE (#555)
- Yeas: 95
- Absent: 10
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor