+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 12, 2014 in the House:
- Effective date: September 1, 2014.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 620.
On May 27, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On May 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 22, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 21, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 88, nays 5, Senate amendments concurred in.
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/21/2014.
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
On May 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 3 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended.
- Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 85, nays 6. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 03/31/2014.
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (17-0).
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Votes (4)
May 21, 2014: House Vote on HB 388, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1108)
- Yeas: 88
- Nays: 5
- Absent: 11
May 14, 2014: Senate Vote on HB 388, AMENDMENT # 4294 BY MORRELL, HB 388 BY JACKSON (#987)
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 34
- Absent: 2
May 14, 2014: Senate Vote on HB 388, FINAL PASSAGE (#988)
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 2
March 31, 2014: House Vote on HB 388, FINAL PASSAGE (#153)
- Yeas: 85
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 14
+ − Sponsors (58)
Type:
Primary Sponsor