+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (3)
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
March 14, 2018: House Vote on HB 385, By Wednesday, March 21, 2018 (#5)
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 49
- Absent: 31
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor