+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (32)
On June 21, 2013 in the House:
- Effective date: June 21, 2013.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 417.
On June 5, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On June 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 3, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 2, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On June 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar.
- Called from the calendar.
- Called from the calendar.
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 2. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 5/8/2013.
- Notice given.
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 50, nays 43. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider pending.
- Called from the calendar.
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar.
- Notice given.
- Scheduled for floor debate on 4/22/2013.
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 4/17/2013.
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably (16-0) (Regular).
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/1/2013.
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (7)
+ − Votes (4)
June 1, 2013: Senate Vote on HB 375, FINAL PASSAGE (#871)
- Yeas: 38
- Absent: 1
May 8, 2013: House Vote on HB 375, CALL FROM THE CALENDAR (#308)
- Yeas: 71
- Nays: 15
- Absent: 19
May 8, 2013: House Vote on HB 375, FINAL PASSAGE (#311)
- Yeas: 98
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 5
April 22, 2013: House Vote on HB 375, FINAL PASSAGE (#90)
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 43
- Absent: 12
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor