+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 3, 2020 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On June 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 1, 2020 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 31, 2020 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
On May 29, 2020 in the House:
- Scheduled for concurrence on 05/31/20.
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
On May 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
- Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
On May 15, 2020 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On May 13, 2020 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/15/20.
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 7, 2020 in the House:
- Reported favorably (13-0).
On May 4, 2020 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
On March 31, 2020 in the House:
- Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
May 31, 2020: House Vote on HB 375, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#690)
- Yeas: 96
- Absent: 8
May 28, 2020: Senate Vote on HB 375, FINAL PASSAGE (#483)
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 4
May 15, 2020: House Vote on HB 375, FINAL PASSAGE (#166)
- Yeas: 94
- Absent: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor