+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 3, 2020 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On June 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 1, 2020 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 31, 2020 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 97, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
On May 27, 2020 in the House:
- Scheduled for concurrence on 05/31/20.
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
On May 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
On May 15, 2020 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On May 13, 2020 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/15/20.
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 7, 2020 in the House:
- Reported favorably (12-0).
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
May 31, 2020: House Vote on HB 371, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#653)
- Yeas: 97
- Absent: 7
May 27, 2020: Senate Vote on HB 371, FINAL PASSAGE (#387)
- Yeas: 31
- Absent: 8
May 15, 2020: House Vote on HB 371, HB 371 BY TURNER (#75)
- Yeas: 97
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor