+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 31, 2018 in the House:
- Effective date: 5/31/2018.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 595.
On May 23, 2018 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On May 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate on 5/22/2018.
On May 18, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 16, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 90, nays 0. The Senate amendments, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, were concurred in.
On May 15, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for concurrence on 05/16/18.
On May 14, 2018 in the House:
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
On May 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
On May 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended.
- Senate Committee amendments read and adopted.
- Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
On May 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement.
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On April 23, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 85, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On April 19, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 04/23/18.
On April 16, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
- Discharged from the Committee on Appropriations.
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
On April 13, 2018 in the House:
- Reported favorably (6-0).
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Retirement.
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement.
On January 26, 2018 in the House:
- First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 1/26/2018.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
May 16, 2018: House Vote on HB 37, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1226)
- Yeas: 90
- Absent: 14
May 14, 2018: Senate Vote on HB 37, FINAL PASSAGE (#1097)
- Yeas: 38
- Absent: 1
May 14, 2018: Senate Vote on HB 37, CO-AUTHORS (#1098)
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 16
April 23, 2018: House Vote on HB 37, FINAL PASSAGE (#540)
- Yeas: 85
- Absent: 20
+ − Sponsors (42)
Type:
Primary Sponsor