+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 83, nays 14. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 5/26/2015.
On May 19, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 18, 2015 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (15-0).
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title.
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Prefiled. To be introduced at a later date.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Vote
May 26, 2015: House Vote on HB 364, FINAL PASSAGE (#507)
- Yeas: 83
- Nays: 14
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsor
Jeff Hall
Type:
Primary Sponsor