+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 4, 2020 in the House:
- Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
On May 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 29, 2020 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On May 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
- Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
On May 22, 2020 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On May 20, 2020 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/20.
On May 18, 2020 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 15, 2020 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (11-0-1).
On May 13, 2020 in the House:
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
On May 7, 2020 in the House:
- Reported favorably (16-0. To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (2)
May 29, 2020: Senate Vote on HB 360, FINAL PASSAGE (#526)
- Yeas: 33
- Absent: 6
May 22, 2020: House Vote on HB 360, FINAL PASSAGE (#388)
- Yeas: 98
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor