+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On June 13, 2019 in the House:
- Effective date: 06/11/19.
On June 11, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 283.
On June 6, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 6, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 29, 2019 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
- Called from the calendar.
- Read by title, returned to the calendar.
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for concurrence on 05/29/19.
On May 20, 2019 in the House:
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/02/19.
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably (10-0-1).
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (3)
May 29, 2019: House Vote on HB 356, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#653)
- Yeas: 96
- Absent: 9
May 20, 2019: Senate Vote on HB 356, FINAL PASSAGE (#411)
- Yeas: 36
- Absent: 3
May 2, 2019: House Vote on HB 356, FINAL PASSAGE (#135)
- Yeas: 93
- Absent: 12
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor