+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (37)
On October 26, 2017 in the House:
- Effective date: 11/16/2017.
On June 30, 2017 in the House:
- Becomes Act No. 429.
On June 12, 2017 in the House:
- Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
On June 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 8, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 91, nays 1. The Senate amendments, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, were concurred in.
- Called from the calendar.
On June 7, 2017 in the House:
- Read by title, returned to the calendar.
- Notice given.
- Scheduled for concurrence on 06/08/17.
On June 6, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for concurrence on 06/07/17.
On June 5, 2017 in the House:
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
- Called from the Calendar.
- Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted.
- Called from the Calendar.
On June 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended.
- Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 54, nays 31. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider pending.
- Rules suspended.
- Rules suspended.
- Called from the calendar.
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/25/17.
- Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 22, 2017 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (7-0-1).
On May 16, 2017 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
On May 15, 2017 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (24-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (8)
+ − Votes (5)
June 8, 2017: House Vote on HB 354, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#922)
- Yeas: 91
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 13
June 5, 2017: Senate Vote on HB 354, FINAL PASSAGE (#852)
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 3
May 25, 2017: House Vote on HB 354, AMENDMENT # 3410 BY JACKSON, MOTION TO ADOPT (#474)
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 55
- Absent: 17
May 25, 2017: House Vote on HB 354, FINAL PASSAGE (#475)
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 31
- Absent: 20
May 25, 2017: House Vote on HB 354, FINAL PASSAGE (#485)
- Yeas: 97
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor