+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 5, 2015 in the House:
- Effective date: August 1, 2015.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 71.
On May 28, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 27, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read by title, passed by a vote of 31 yeas and 3 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 2. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 5/4/2015.
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably (13-0).
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
- Prefiled.
+ − Votes (3)
May 26, 2015: Senate Vote on HB 350, FINAL PASSAGE (#526)
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 5
May 4, 2015: House Vote on HB 350, FINAL PASSAGE (#154)
- Yeas: 92
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 11
May 4, 2015: House Vote on HB 350, FINAL PASSAGE (#154)
- Yeas: 93
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 10
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor