+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 14, 2021 in the House:
- Effective date: 07/01/2021.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 307.
On June 11, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 9, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 8, 2021 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 99, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
On June 7, 2021 in the House:
- Scheduled for concurrence on 06/08/2021.
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
On June 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On May 10, 2021 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/13/2021.
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably (10-0).
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
On April 2, 2021 in the House:
- First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021.
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Prefiled. To be introduced at a later date.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
June 8, 2021: House Vote on HB 341, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1104)
- Yeas: 99
- Absent: 6
June 6, 2021: Senate Vote on HB 341, FINAL PASSAGE (#816)
- Yeas: 37
- Absent: 1
May 13, 2021: House Vote on HB 341, FINAL PASSAGE (#447)
- Yeas: 98
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor