+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 22, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 165.
- Effective date: 08/01/2014.
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On May 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 13, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 88, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
On May 8, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for concurrence on 05/13/2014.
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
On May 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On April 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 100, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 04/07/2014.
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (15-0).
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (3)
May 13, 2014: House Vote on HB 340, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#869)
- Yeas: 88
- Absent: 16
May 6, 2014: Senate Vote on HB 340, FINAL PASSAGE (#723)
- Yeas: 38
- Absent: 1
April 7, 2014: House Vote on HB 340, FINAL PASSAGE (#287)
- Yeas: 100
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor