+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On July 1, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 393.
- Effective date: August 1, 2015.
On June 12, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 11, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 10, 2015 in the House:
- Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
On June 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays.
- Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
On June 10, 2015 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 95, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
- Rules suspended.
- Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
On June 9, 2015 in the House:
- Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate conference committee members appointed: Morrell, Amedee, and Peterson.
On June 8, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 91, nays 4, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
- Read by title, returned to the calendar.
- Called from the calendar.
- House conferees appointed: Berthelot, Arnold, and Foil.
On June 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
- Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
On June 3, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 6/08/2015.
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On May 7, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 5/12/2015.
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (15-0).
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (5)
June 10, 2015: House Vote on HB 331, ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1059)
- Yeas: 95
- Absent: 10
June 10, 2015: Senate Vote on HB 331, ADOPT (#1060)
- Yeas: 36
- Absent: 3
June 8, 2015: House Vote on HB 331, REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#892)
- Yeas: 91
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 10
June 3, 2015: Senate Vote on HB 331, FINAL PASSAGE (#689)
- Yeas: 36
- Absent: 3
May 12, 2015: House Vote on HB 331, FINAL PASSAGE (#298)
- Yeas: 95
- Absent: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor