+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 1, 2018 in the House:
- Effective date: 08/01/2018.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 9.
On April 25, 2018 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On April 23, 2018 in the House:
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On April 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On April 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
On April 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 75, nays 19. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 03/28/18.
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Reported favorably (6-3).
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
- Prefiled.
+ − Votes (2)
April 23, 2018: Senate Vote on HB 325, FINAL PASSAGE (#482)
- Yeas: 32
- Absent: 7
March 28, 2018: House Vote on HB 325, FINAL PASSAGE (#173)
- Yeas: 75
- Nays: 19
- Absent: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor