+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 22, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 161.
- Effective date: 08/01/2014.
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On May 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 13, 2014 in the House:
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On May 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 04/23/2014.
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
- Reported favorably (6-0).
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
- Prefiled.
+ − Votes (2)
May 13, 2014: Senate Vote on HB 318, FINAL PASSAGE (#875)
- Yeas: 38
- Absent: 1
April 23, 2014: House Vote on HB 318, FINAL PASSAGE (#556)
- Yeas: 97
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor