+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 1, 2020 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On May 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 28, 2020 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On May 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read by title, passed by a vote of 26 yeas and 8 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
- Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
On May 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On May 20, 2020 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On May 18, 2020 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/20/20.
On May 15, 2020 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 13, 2020 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (15-0).
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (2)
May 27, 2020: Senate Vote on HB 313, FINAL PASSAGE (#416)
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 8
- Absent: 5
May 20, 2020: House Vote on HB 313, HB 313 BY PRESSLY (#216)
- Yeas: 92
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 12
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor