+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 78, nays 17. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
- Called from the calendar.
On May 20, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/19.
- Notice given.
- Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Rules suspended, called out of its regular order.
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 62, nays 27. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider pending.
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/16/19.
- Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (7-0).
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (13-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Votes (3)
May 22, 2019: House Vote on HB 291, FINAL PASSAGE (#509)
- Yeas: 77
- Nays: 17
- Absent: 11
May 22, 2019: House Vote on HB 291, FINAL PASSAGE (#509)
- Yeas: 78
- Nays: 17
- Absent: 10
May 16, 2019: House Vote on HB 291, FINAL PASSAGE (#377)
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 27
- Absent: 16
+ − Sponsors (43)
Type:
Primary Sponsor