+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On July 1, 2015 in the House:
- Effective date: July 1, 2015.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 389.
On June 11, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 9, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 94, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
On June 7, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for concurrence on 6/09/2015.
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
On June 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
On May 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On May 19, 2015 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 5/19/2015.
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 7, 2015 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (13-0).
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (3)
June 9, 2015: House Vote on HB 287, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#939)
- Yeas: 94
- Absent: 11
June 5, 2015: Senate Vote on HB 287, FINAL PASSAGE (#801)
- Yeas: 37
- Absent: 2
May 19, 2015: House Vote on HB 287, FINAL PASSAGE (#396)
- Yeas: 99
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor