+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 3, 2017 in the House:
- Effective date: 08/01/17.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 53.
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 24, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 5 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
- Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
- Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
- Rules suspended.
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 04/26/17.
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably (14-0).
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 23, 2017: Senate Vote on HB 286, FINAL PASSAGE (#446)
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 5
- Absent: 1
April 26, 2017: House Vote on HB 286, FINAL PASSAGE (#61)
- Yeas: 95
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor