+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 11, 2021 in the House:
- Effective date: 08/01/2021.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 196.
On June 2, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 1, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 26, 2021 in the House:
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On May 11, 2021 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 103, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/11/2021.
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (10-0).
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
On April 2, 2021 in the House:
- First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021.
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (2)
May 26, 2021: Senate Vote on HB 280, FINAL PASSAGE (#534)
- Yeas: 37
- Absent: 1
May 11, 2021: House Vote on HB 280, FINAL PASSAGE (#371)
- Yeas: 103
- Absent: 2