+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 4/17/2013.
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (15-0) (Regular).
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/1/2013.
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Vote
April 17, 2013: House Vote on HB 273, FINAL PASSAGE (#50)
- Yeas: 98
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor