+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 11, 2019 in the House:
- Effective date: 08/01/2019.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 305.
On June 5, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On June 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 3, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 2, 2019 in the House:
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On June 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
- Rules suspended.
On May 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 87, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/14/19.
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably (11-0).
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
- Prefiled.
+ − Votes (2)
June 2, 2019: Senate Vote on HB 269, FINAL PASSAGE (#828)
- Yeas: 38
- Absent: 1
May 14, 2019: House Vote on HB 269, FINAL PASSAGE (#281)
- Yeas: 87
- Absent: 18
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor