+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 19, 2015 in the House:
- Effective date: August 1, 2015.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 106.
On June 2, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 28, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 27, 2015 in the House:
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 84, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 5/4/2015.
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably (14-0).
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
- Prefiled.
+ − Votes (2)
May 27, 2015: Senate Vote on HB 267, FINAL PASSAGE (#568)
- Yeas: 38
- Absent: 1
May 4, 2015: House Vote on HB 267, FINAL PASSAGE (#147)
- Yeas: 84
- Absent: 21
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor