+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (34)
On May 31, 2018 in the House:
- Effective date: 03/01/2019.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 636.
On May 23, 2018 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On May 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate on 5/22/2018.
On May 18, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 17, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 54, nays 42, Senate amendments concurred in.
- Called from the calendar.
- Read by title, returned to the calendar.
On May 16, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for concurrence on 05/17/18.
On May 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 24 yeas and 13 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 16, 2018 in the House:
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
On May 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
- Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
On May 10, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 59, nays 42. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
- Called from the calendar.
On May 8, 2018 in the House:
- Rules suspended.
- Motion to reconsider called from the table.
- Notice given.
- Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/10/18.
On May 2, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 51, nays 43. Failed to pass.
On April 25, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/02/18.
- Notice given.
- Read by title, returned to the calendar.
- Reconsidered.
- Motion to reconsider called from the table.
On April 17, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 35, nays 53. Failed to pass.
On April 13, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 04/17/18.
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- Reported favorably (7-2).
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (7)
May 17, 2018: House Vote on HB 265, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1319)
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 42
- Absent: 8
May 16, 2018: Senate Vote on HB 265, FINAL PASSAGE (#1226)
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 13
- Absent: 2
May 10, 2018: House Vote on HB 265, FINAL PASSAGE (#904)
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 42
- Absent: 4
May 10, 2018: House Vote on HB 265, FINAL PASSAGE (#904)
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 40
- Absent: 5
May 10, 2018: House Vote on HB 265, FINAL PASSAGE (#904)
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 39
- Absent: 5
May 2, 2018: House Vote on HB 265, FINAL PASSAGE (#681)
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 43
- Absent: 11
April 17, 2018: House Vote on HB 265, FINAL PASSAGE (#480)
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 53
- Absent: 17
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor