+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On July 21, 2021 in the House:
- Read by title, returned to the calendar.
On July 20, 2021 in the House:
- Veto message read. Lies over under the rules.
On July 1, 2021 in the House:
- Vetoed by the Governor.
On June 11, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 8, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 7, 2021 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 98, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
On June 3, 2021 in the House:
- Scheduled for concurrence on 06/07/2021.
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
On June 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On May 10, 2021 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 100, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/10/2021.
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably (10-0).
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
On April 2, 2021 in the House:
- First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021.
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (3)
June 7, 2021: House Vote on HB 263, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1016)
- Yeas: 98
- Absent: 7
June 2, 2021: Senate Vote on HB 263, FINAL PASSAGE (#704)
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 3
May 10, 2021: House Vote on HB 263, FINAL PASSAGE (#311)
- Yeas: 100
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor