+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
- Rules suspended.
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
- Rules suspended.
- Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On May 18, 2017 in the House:
- Called from the calendar.
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On May 16, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/17.
- Notice given.
On May 15, 2017 in the House:
- Read by title, returned to the calendar.
On May 11, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/15/17.
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably (12-0).
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Prefiled. To be introduced at a later date.
+ − Vote
May 18, 2017: House Vote on HB 262, FINAL PASSAGE (#371)
- Yeas: 89
- Absent: 16
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor