+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 1, 2021 in the House:
- Effective date: See Act.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 20.
On May 18, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 11, 2021 in the House:
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 04/28/2021.
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (11-0).
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
On April 2, 2021 in the House:
- First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021.
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 11, 2021: Senate Vote on HB 260, FINAL PASSAGE (#331)
- Yeas: 33
- Absent: 5
April 28, 2021: House Vote on HB 260, FINAL PASSAGE (#106)
- Yeas: 98
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor