+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On July 1, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 386.
- Effective date: See Act.
On June 12, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On June 11, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/12/2015.
On June 11, 2015 in the House:
- Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 31 yeas and 2 nays.
- Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
On June 11, 2015 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 85, nays 2. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
On June 10, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 6/11/2015.
- Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
On June 9, 2015 in the House:
- House conferees appointed: Thierry, Robideaux, and Thibaut.
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 91, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
On June 9, 2015 in the House:
- Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate conference committee members appointed: Riser, Morrish, and Morrell.
- Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
On June 7, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for concurrence on 6/09/2015.
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
On June 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On June 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
- Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 4. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 5/26/2015.
On May 19, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 18, 2015 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (14-0).
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (5)
June 11, 2015: House Vote on HB 259, ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1076)
- Yeas: 85
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 18
June 11, 2015: Senate Vote on HB 259, ADOPT (#1086)
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 6
June 9, 2015: House Vote on HB 259, REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#934)
- Yeas: 90
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 14
June 6, 2015: Senate Vote on HB 259, FINAL PASSAGE (#901)
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
May 26, 2015: House Vote on HB 259, FINAL PASSAGE (#503)
- Yeas: 94
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor