+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 28, 2018 in the House:
- Effective date: 08/01/2018.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 542.
On May 18, 2018 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On May 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 17, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 16, 2018 in the House:
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On May 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
- Rules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On May 1, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 88, nays 3. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On April 27, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/01/18.
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 25, 2018 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (7-3).
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 16, 2018: Senate Vote on HB 253, FINAL PASSAGE (#1210)
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 6
May 1, 2018: House Vote on HB 253, FINAL PASSAGE (#659)
- Yeas: 88
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 14
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor