+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 3, 2017 in the House:
- Effective date: 06/03/17.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 40.
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 24, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 66, nays 25. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/03/17.
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably (13-0).
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
- Prefiled.
+ − Votes (2)
May 23, 2017: Senate Vote on HB 250, FINAL PASSAGE (#456)
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
May 3, 2017: House Vote on HB 250, FINAL PASSAGE (#152)
- Yeas: 66
- Nays: 25
- Absent: 13
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor