+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, returned to the calendar.
On March 31, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 04/05/2016.
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On March 28, 2016 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (9-0).
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement.
On January 29, 2016 in the House:
- First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 1/22/2016.
On January 22, 2016 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor